HI HB1871 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts Department of Hawaiian Home Lands lessees from building codes and building-permitting requirements. Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to establish its own building code and building-permitting requirements. Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to provide notice of water, sewer, and traffic effects.
Title
DHHL Lessees; Building Codes and Building-permitting Requirements; Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 12 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Re-referred to EEP/HSG, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to WLO/EEP/HSG, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1871 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1871_.HTM |