HI HB187 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH/CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH/CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a family court to make findings, after a hearing and in writing, before a minor can be transferred to an adult jail or lockup or be permitted sight or sound contact with adult offenders.
Title
Relating To The Detention Of A Minor In An Adult Jail Or Lockup.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH/CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB187 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH/CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB386 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Act 061, 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
SB386 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Act 061, 06/23/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=187&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB187_.HTM |