HI HB1866 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the healthy aging partnership program to further the program's role in improving the health and well-being of Hawaii's kupuna. Effective 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Healthy Aging Partnership Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 263-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2335 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).