HI HB1863 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for state-funded access to legal services to residential tenants in actions or proceedings for possession, with full access to each income-eligible tenant available by 7/1/2027. Authorizes attorneys, paralegals, and law students to provide the legal services. Appropriates funds for the judiciary to contract for the legal services. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Landlord-tenant Disputes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Access to Representation
Action or Proceeding for Possession
Appropriation ($)
Judiciary
Landlord
Legal Services
Tenant
Action or Proceeding for Possession
Appropriation ($)
Judiciary
Landlord
Legal Services
Tenant