HI HB1857 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the elements required to establish: (1) sexual assault in the first, second, and third degrees with regard to subjecting another person to sexual penetration by compulsion, and (2) sexual assault in the third degree with regard to sexual contact by compulsion.
Title
Sexual Assault; Sexual Penetration or Contact by Compulsion; Elements
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday, 02-18-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1857&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1857_.HTM |