HI HB1848 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all general excise tax monthly returns to be filed electronically, beginning on 1/1/2015. Authorizes the director of taxation to assess fines for returns filed manually. Reduces the threshold amount for electronic funds transfers. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Monthly Returns; Electronic Filing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ige Chair; Chun Oakland, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Yamashita, Johanson Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 259). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |