HI HB1847 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that when an appointing authority, prior to release or discharge of an employee, is considering the feasibility of transferring or demoting the employee to another position for which the employee qualifies, the transfer or demotion considered shall be to another position within the appointing authority's department. (HB1847 HD1)
Title
Civil Service Discharge Conditions
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura, Say excused (2). | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Okamura, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-27-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |