HI HB1834 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to increase the base budget of the Department of Human Services' Homeless Programs Office. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3200) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett. |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-09 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 02-09-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |