HI HB1831 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes in the State's policies for the physical environment under the Hawaii State Planning Act, the development of a statewide beach assessment study and a restoration and conservation plan.
Title
Relating To Beaches.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3027 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1831&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1831_.HTM |