HI HB1831 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the mandatory lease-to-fee conversion of leasehold business property.
Title
Leasehold Conversion; Business Properties
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 01-24-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-13 | (H) Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1831 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1831_.HTM |