HI HB1827 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Act 089, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Act 089, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations and Department of Education to support health care workforce development programs, specifically the public high school health care workforce certificate program and glidepath program for certified nurse aides. Appropriates funds to renovate and equip certain public high school classrooms to be used for health care training. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Healthcare Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | Act 089, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2024-06-28 | House | Act 089, on 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 126-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 126-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson, Garrett, La Chica, Lamosao, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-24 10:02AM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-24 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Woodson, Garrett Co-Chairs; La Chica, Lamosao, Alcos. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 516) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3679) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-24 10:10AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to LBT/EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Martinez, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO/EDN on Thursday, 02-08-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3225 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Referred to LBT/EDU, WAM.