HI HB1818 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 193, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 193, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Public Safety to provide reentry/reintegration programs in Hawaii's correctional facilities that offer cognitive behavioral theory with cultural and other interventions to address domestic violence, addictions, self-mastery through identity, and community connections for successful transitions back into the community. (HB1818 CD1)
Title
Corrections; Rehabilitation; Native Hawaiians
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 193, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 685). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 193, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 447). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 25-10). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 25-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-21 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Hee, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Shimabukuro, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 9:15AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-16-10 9:55AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-14 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-15-10 9:20AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-14-10 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Hanohano, Carroll, Aquino Co-Chairs; Awana, Shimabukuro, Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3012) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2785) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-17-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-10 1:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 169). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:35PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-22-10. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-19-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-10-10 10:00am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HAW with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HAW. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Yamashita. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-09-09 3:30pm in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-05-09 9:15AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to PBS, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |