HI HB1817 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-time amnesty program for liabilities for taxable years beginning on or transactions occurring on or after 01/01/2000 through taxable periods ending on or transactions occurring on 12/31/2023. Specifies that the amnesty period begins 01/01/2025 and completes no later than 12/31/2025.
Title
Relating To Tax Amnesty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1817&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1817_.HTM |