HI HB1814 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary fetal alcohol spectrum disorders task force within the Department of Health for administrative purposes. Requires a report to the Legislature. Establishes the fetal alcohol spectrum disorders special fund, to be administered by the Department of Human Services, and which shall consist of federal funds and interest earned on those funds.
Title
Relating To Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2647 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1814&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1814_.HTM |