HI HB1803 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For pass-through entities electing to pay Hawaii taxes at the entity level, reduces the pass-through entity level tax rate and allows the tax credit to be carried forward to subsequent years. Takes effect 7/1/2040. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pass-through Entity Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 703-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Gates, Lowen. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |