HI HB179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB179
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes violation of privacy in the first degree, and certain subsections of violation of privacy in the second degree, from qualifying for deferred acceptance of guilty plea or nolo contendere plea.
Title
Relating To Violation Of Privacy.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB179 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
SB413 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Act 033, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
SB413 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Act 033, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1133).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=179&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB179_.HTM |