HI HB179 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB179

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Excludes violation of privacy in the first degree, and certain subsections of violation of privacy in the second degree, from qualifying for deferred acceptance of guilty plea or nolo contendere plea.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Violation Of Privacy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB413 (Same As)
HB179 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback