HI HB1789 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the representative of labor on the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to be a person whose name has been selected by a simple majority of the exclusive representatives of the collective bargaining units and submitted to the Governor for appointment. Requires the Governor to submit the name of the nominee to the Senate for advice and consent no later than twenty days after exclusive representatives' submittal of the nominee's name to the Governor, and if the Governor fails to do so, requires the exclusive representatives who recommended the nominee to transmit the nominee's name directly to the Senate for confirmation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 767). |
2022-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Marten, Ohno, Tokioka excused (4). |
2022-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 744). |
2022-04-21 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-08-22. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 514). |
2022-04-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 717) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3746) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 864-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-10-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-01 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2706 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to LCA, JDC .