HI HB1789 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a nonrefundable income tax credit of 25% of the total costs, including installation costs, of an automatic fire suppression system in any new detached 1- or 2-family dwelling unit in a structure used only for residential purposes. Sunsets on 6/30/25. (HB1789 HD1)
Title
Relating To Automatic Fire Suppression Systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 586-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2157 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.