HI HB1782 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits the convictions that may be used in employment decisions from all convictions in the most recent ten years to felony convictions that occurred in a certain time period and misdemeanor convictions that occurred in a certain time period. Takes effect on 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employment Discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-18SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 133).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane.
2020-02-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-24HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
2020-02-13HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-21HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 2
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2193 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback