HI HB1781 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for additional use of the Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette certification fees to support the state fire council and its programs and activities.
Title
Relating To Fire Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2184 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1781&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1781_.HTM |