HI HB1778 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the offender reentry office of the department of public safety to develop and implement a risk needs assessment tool that is specifically intended to assess the needs of female offenders. Requires a report to the legislature. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Comprehensive Offender Reentry System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2639 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).