HI HB1775 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "confidential personal information" with regard to offenses against property rights. (HB1775 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Definition Of Confidential Personal Information.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-02-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2178 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to JDC.