HI HB1771 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 3:30PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 3:30PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for Fiscal Year 2014-2015 to support operational mission readiness activities of the Hawaii Wing of the Civil Air Patrol, including facilities maintenance and capital improvements not funded by the National Civil Air Patrol. Effective 7/1/2030. (HB1771 SD1)
Title
Civil Air Patrol; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-14 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3351) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2947) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Green. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 250). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2605 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28