HI HB177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 239, 07/06/2021, (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 239, 07/06/2021, (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offenses of sexual assault in the first and third degree perpetrated against a person who is mentally defective to provide that a perpetrator commits the offense if the perpetrator is negligent in not knowing of the mental defect of the victim. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 239, 07/06/2021, (Gov. Msg. No. 1367). |
2021-07-08 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 239, 07/06/2021, (Gov. Msg. No. 1367). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 6). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 6) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-21 2:00PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi Chair; Takumi, Todd, Ward. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 320). |
2021-03-30 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 9:15AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 196). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB411 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to HMS, JDC.