HI HB1769 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends to an unspecified number of days a legislative body's deadline to approve, approve with modification, or disapprove an affordable housing project. Effective 7/1/2025. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2160 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Re-Referred to HOU/WTL, JDC.