HI HB1768 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the ceiling for construction contract bid security requirements from $25,000 to $50,000. (HB1768 HD1)
Title
Procurement; Bid Ceiling Limit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-06-09 10:15 AM in conference room 016. | |
2009-04-02 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 04-06-09 10:15 AM in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-20 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-09 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to JGO, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 322). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-02-09 11:30am in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-12-09 7:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |