HI HB1767 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands exceptions to the general prohibitions on fireworks. Imposes requirements upon shippers of fireworks.
Title
Fire Council Package; Fireworks; Shippers; Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2166 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to PSM/TRE, CPH/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1767&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1767_.HTM |