HI HB1766 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority for public housing improvements and renovations, and to administer a Rent Supplement Program. Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to administer the Housing First, Rapid Rehousing, and Family Assessment Center programs, and conduct outreach. Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to conduct outreach and counseling, and administer the Law Enforcement Assisted Diversion Pilot Project. (HB1766 HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2873 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to HOU/HMS/CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Homelessness
Housing
Housing First
Law Enforcement Assisted Diversion Program
Oahu Family Assessment Center
Outreach
Rapid Rehousing
State Rent Supplement
Homelessness
Housing
Housing First
Law Enforcement Assisted Diversion Program
Oahu Family Assessment Center
Outreach
Rapid Rehousing
State Rent Supplement