HI HB1759 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to promptly pay clean claims for services and repeals the exemption of Medicaid claims from the clean claims definition, as well as claims from self-insured employer groups and claims for services rendered to individuals associated with a health care entity through a national participating provider network. (HB1759 HD2)
Title
Medicaid; Health Insurance; Payment; Clean Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-16 2:00PM. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-16 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-01-29 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-29-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2667 (Same As) 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.