HI HB1755 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Fire Council to administer and expend funds from the reduced ignition propensity cigarette program special fund to support statewide fire prevention and safety programs.
Title
Relating To Fire Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2129 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1755&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1755_.HTM |