HI HB1744 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to support the University of Hawaii at Manoa's McNair Student Achievement Program and establish two full-time equivalent (2.0 FTE) positions to oversee and administer the program. Effective July 1, 2525. (HB1744 HD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; McNair Student Achievement Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takai. |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 01-30-14 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2506 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HRE, WAM.