HI HB1733 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on JUD/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on JUD/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a Class C felony to purchase, manufacture, or otherwise obtain firearm parts for the purpose of assembling a firearm having no serial number. Amends certain requirements relating to firearms registration.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/PVM on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to JUD/PVM, referral sheet 12 |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2151 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1733&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1733_.HTM |