HI HB1733 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to make recommendations for the Hawaii Disaster Resilience Plan. Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to prepare the plan. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Hawaii Disaster Resilience Plan; Hawaii Disaster Resilience Task Force ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-30-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to PBS, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1733&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1733_.HTM |