HI HB1733 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the temporary transfer of interest from certain special funds, revolving funds, and special accounts to the general fund.
Title
Interest Earned on Certain Special Funds, Revolving Funds, Special Accounts; Temporary Transfer to General Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-09 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1733&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1733_.HTM |