HI HB1730 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the land use commission to adopt rules specifying its processes when considering its members' conflicts of interest. (SD1)
Title
Land Use Commission; Conflict of Interest
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3009) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to WLH, JDL. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 72). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-21-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura, Say excused (2). | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Riviere. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 01-27-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-12 | (H) Prefiled |