HI HB1730 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds to fund construction of the cancer research center of Hawaii. Authorizes transfer of funds from the Hawaii cancer research special fund into the state general fund. (HB1730 HD1)
Title
Cancer Research Center of Hawaii; General Fund; G.O. Bonds
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to HRE/HTH, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 329). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 729) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |