HI HB1729 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that payments of the amounts attributable to the interest on the principal of the general obligation bonds authorized and issued for the acquisition and renovation of the old federal building for the department of commerce and consumer affairs be made out of the compliance resolution fund.
Title
Old Federal Building Acquisition; Compliance Resolution Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2009-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-09 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 328). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Finnegan, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |