HI HB1722 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a grant program and special fund to assist beneficiaries on Hawaiian home lands with cesspool upgrade or conversion costs. Establishes that a recipient of a cesspool upgrade grant shall not be eligible for the cesspool upgrade, conversion, or connection income tax credit. Appropriates moneys for the grant program. (HB1722 HD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP/WAL. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-18. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred to OMH, EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2717 (Same As) 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Cesspools
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Grant Program
Upgrade, Conversion, or Connection
Cesspools
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Grant Program
Upgrade, Conversion, or Connection