HI HB1708 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "disclosure date" to mean the date on which the electioneering communication is publicly distributed. Expands the definition of "electioneering communication" to apply to advertisements sent by any mail rate and communications regarding expenditures of the organization. Makes a conforming statutory amendment relating to the determination of the date by which a person is deemed to have made a campaign expenditure.
Title
Relating To Electioneering Communications.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2149 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1708&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1708_.HTM |