HI SB2149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the electioneering communication section only to noncandidate committees. Amends the definition of "disclosure date" to mean the date on which the electioneering communication is publicly distributed. Expands the definition of "electioneering communication" to apply to advertisements sent by any mail rate and communications regarding expenditures of the organization. Makes a conforming statutory amendment relating to the determination of the date by which a person is deemed to have made a campaign expenditure. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electioneering Communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 03-16-20 at 2:00 PM. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:31PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3030) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1708 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.