HI HB1706 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that excess contributions by nonresident contributors shall be returned to a nonresident contributor of the candidate' or candidate committee's within 30 days of notice of the excess from the Campaign Spending Commission, after determination of any excess by the Commission based on the final election period report, or else escheat to the Hawaii election campaign fund. Takes effect 11/4/2020. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Campaign Contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).
2020-07-06HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2020-07-02HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 557) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-07-02SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-06-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-02-20.
2020-06-30SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-30SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3726) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-06-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:05AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to JDC.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 293).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-27HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1).
2020-02-27HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 794-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Say.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-21HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 1
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-15HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2147 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback