HI HB1702 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the net capital gain from the sale of a residential property by a taxpayer who is sixty-five years of age or older from the capital gains tax.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-11-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1702&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1702_.HTM |