HI HB170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain totally and permanently disabled veterans from paying the State motor vehicle registration fee. (HB170 HD2)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration Fee; Veterans; Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 464) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to VMI, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB539 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.