HI HB1699 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide meal breaks for employees who work more than a total of five hours a day. Imposes penalties for failure to provide meal breaks. Clarifies that the penalty is based on an employee's regular hourly rate of pay at the time the infraction occurred. Effective December 31, 2057. (HD2)
Title
Meal Breaks
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-12 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Marumoto, Souki, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Cabanilla, Ito, Luke, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Herkes, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, McKelvey. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-12 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4). | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Brower, Evans, Tsuji, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Nishimoto, Marumoto. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Aquino, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamashita, Cullen, Luke, Okamura, Saiki, Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Friday, 01-27-12 10:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) Prefiled |