HI HB169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 093, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 093, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of fair market rental value. Increases the transient accommodations tax imposed on resort time share vacation units by 1 per cent each year to gradually achieve a rate of 9.25 per cent of the fair market rental value. (HB169 CD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Increase; Resort Time Share Vacation Units
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 093, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 093, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har, McKelvey, Pouha, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Ohno, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:00 PM in Conference Room 309. |
2015-04-30 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 05-01-15 11:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-29 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Kouchi. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 632). |
2015-04-23 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TSI, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 32). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McKelvey, Pouha, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ohno, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Kawakami, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito. |
2015-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-11-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |