HI HB1683 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with the Commission to Promote and Advance Civic Education, to develop and implement curriculum in civic education as a component of high school United States history courses.
Title
Relating To Civic Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Civic Education
Commission to Promote and Advance Civic Education
Curriculum
DOE
Judiciary
Civic Education
Commission to Promote and Advance Civic Education
Curriculum
DOE
Judiciary
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1683&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1683_.HTM |