HI HB168 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows state boards to hold meetings closed to the public to consider statements and information obtained from witnesses or victims during an investigation into the hiring, evaluation, dismissal, or discipline of an officer or employee, or of charges brought against the officer or employee.
Title
Relating To Public Agency Meetings And Records.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB168 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 1
SB393 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
SB393 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=168&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB168_.HTM |