HI HB168 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - (H) Re-referred to LAB, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - (H) Re-referred to LAB, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum hourly wage to $8.50 per hour beginning July 1, 2011 and ending December 31, 2012. Adjusts the minimum hourly wage thereafter in accordance with consumer price index.
Title
Minimum Wage; Consumer Price Index
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | (H) Re-referred to LAB, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=168 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB168_.HTM |