HI HB1679 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all telecommunications service providers to communicate relevant information relating to the deenergization of electrical lines to public safety or emergency response offices for the affected areas. Requires all electric utility companies to operate electrical lines and equipment in a manner that shall minimize the risk of catastrophic wildfire posed by the electrical lines and equipment. Requires each electric utility company to prepare a wildfire mitigation plan and protocols for deenergizing electrical lines.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2091 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, referral sheet 16
Subjects
Deenergizing Electrical Lines
Electric Utilities
Mitigation Plan
Notification
Telecommunications
Wildfires
Electric Utilities
Mitigation Plan
Notification
Telecommunications
Wildfires
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1679&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1679_.HTM |